EP1271492 - Urging structure for an output shaft of a drive motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawada, Nobutaka, c/o Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works, 25-1 Aza Nishimachi, Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Togashi, Jun, c/o Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works, 25-1 Aza Nishimachi, Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Kinoshita, Hideki, c/o Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works, 25-1 Aza Nishimachi, Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Mizoguchi, Takashi, c/o Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works, 25-1 Aza Nishimachi, Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 05 /
Yasaki, Akira, c/o Pioneer Corporation Kawagoe Works, 25-1 Aza Nishimachi, Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253709.6 | 27.05.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | JP20010181742 | 15.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001181742 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271492 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271492 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/085, G11B5/55, G11B19/20, H02K5/24, H02K7/08 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H02K5/24 (EP,US);
F16C17/08 (EP,US);
G11B7/08582 (EP,US);
H02K7/083 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/39] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Anpressvorrichtung für die Ausgangswelle eines Antriebsmotors | [2003/01] | English: | Urging structure for an output shaft of a drive motor | [2003/01] | French: | Structure de pression pour l'arbre de sortie d'un moteur | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/34] | 04.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH06133490 ; | [XY]US3848477 (GIANDINOTO A, et al) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [XY]DE2714332 (PAPST MOTOREN KG) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 14 - page 5, column 15; figure B * [Y] 4; | [XY]DE2809390 (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER) [X] 1,3 * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 4; figures 4,7 *[Y] 4; | [X]GB2147728 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 92 - page 3, line 9; figure 4 *; | [XY]US5886438 (KAWANISHI TOSHIAKI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [XY]EP1035632 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0020] - [0033]; figures 1,5,6 * [Y] 2,4; | [XY]EP1041698 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0047] - [0050]; figures 5,6 * [Y] 2,4 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940812), vol. 018, no. 434, Database accession no. (E - 1592), & JP06133490 A 19940513 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 4 |