EP1271945 - Video signal generating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Hong-gyu 212-1302 LG Village, Keumgok-dong, Kweonsun-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner, Shipley & Co., 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253749.2 | 29.05.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | KR20010035323 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: KR 2001035323 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1271945 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1271945 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/775 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G11B19/02 (EP);
G11B31/00 (EP,KR);
H04N5/775 (EP);
H04N9/7925 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2007/34] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Videsignal-Erzeugungsanlage | [2003/01] | English: | Video signal generating apparatus | [2003/01] | French: | Appareil de génération de signal vidéo | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 14.06.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 16.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/34] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0400745 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 1, column 2, line 2 - line 5 * * page 2, column 1, line 2 - line 3 * * page 2, column 1, line 8 - line 20 * * page 5, column 1, line 20 - line 37 * * page 6, column 2, line 7 - line 15 *; | [X]EP0507433 (HOOPWELL LTD [GB]) [X] 1-10 * page 4, line 19 - line 20 * * page 4, line 34 - line 36 *; | [X]GB2343810 (VIDEO TECH DESIGNS PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 10 - line 17 *; | [A]US6177961 (BLATTER HAROLD [US]) [A] 3-5 * column 2, line 19 - line 28 ** column 2, line 61 - line 67 * |