EP1273677 - Method of depositing optical films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dalsa Semiconductor Inc. 605 McMurray Road Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2E9 / CA | [2006/28] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states DALSA Semiconductor Inc. 605 McMurray Road Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2E9 / CA | ||
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Zarlink Semiconductor Inc. 400 March Road Kanata, Ontario K2K 3H4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ouellet, Luc 503 du Rubannier Granby, Québec J2H 2R8 / CA | 02 /
Lachance, Jonathan 535 Brunelle Granby, Québec J2G 9C9 / CA | 03 /
Grondin, Manuel 492 Auger Granby, Québec J2J 1E3 / CA | 04 /
Blain, Stephane 1400 Tetreault Sherbrooke, Québec J1K 2N6 / CA | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Harding, Richard Patrick Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2003/02] | Harding, Richard Patrick Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253833.4 | 30.05.2002 | [2003/02] | Priority number, date | US20010867662 | 31.05.2001 Original published format: US 867662 | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1273677 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1273677 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1273677 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/54, C23C16/40, G02B1/10, G02B6/10, C23C16/52 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
C23C16/54 (EP,US);
C23C16/401 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/02] | C23C16/54, C23C16/40, G02B1/10, G02B6/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/43] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [2003/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung optischer Schichten | [2003/02] | English: | Method of depositing optical films | [2003/02] | French: | Méthode de fabrication de films optiques | [2003/02] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 08.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) SE | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR | 08.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4236905 (DABBY FRANKLIN W, et al) [A] 1-29 * column 3, line 1 - line 23 *; | [A]US4394401 (SHIOYA YOSHIMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-29 * example 2 *; | [XY]EP0788148 (ASM JAPAN [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,9 * column 4, line 1 - line 23; figure 4 * [Y] 4-8,10-12; | [Y]US5660895 (LEE GIL S [US], et al) [Y] 29 * figure 16; example 16 *; | [Y]US6130172 (FULLER ROBERT T [US], et al) [Y] 10-12 * column 6, line 15 - line 22 *; | [PX]EP1134073 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-4,13,17,19* paragraphs [0033] , [0037] , [0097] , [0104] - [0107] *; | [XY] - KIM K ET AL, "PROPERTIES OF LOW DIELECTRIC CONSTANT FLUORINATED SILICON OXIDE FILMS PREPARED BY PLASMA ENHANCED CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19981102), vol. 332, no. 1/2, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 369 - 374, XP000669232 [X] 20-28 * paragraph [0002] * [Y] 8,29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(98)01039-6 | [XY] - TAKAMATSU A ET AL, "PLASMA-ACTIVATED DEPOSITON AND PROPERTIES OF PHOSPHOSILICATE GLASS FILM", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, US, (198408), vol. 131, no. 8, ISSN 0013-4651, pages 1865 - 1870, XP000839945 [X] 20 *Eperimental* [Y] 4-7 |