EP1371337 - Grooved dental drill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weathers, Arthur K., Dr. 14 Hudson Road Griffin Georgia / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Weathers, Arthur K., Dr. 14 Hudson Road Griffin, Georgia / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Peter Richard Piper Lambert 120 Queens Road Leicester LE2 3FL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Lambert, Peter Richard Piper Lambert 120 Queens Road Leicester LE2 3FL / GB | ||
Former [2003/51] | Dearing-Lambert, Peter Richard Piper Lambert 120 Queens Road Leicester LE2 3FL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253887.0 | 05.06.2002 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1371337 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61C1/05, A61C19/08 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
A61C8/0089 (EP,US);
A61B17/176 (EP,US);
A61B17/3472 (EP,US);
A61C19/08 (EP,US);
A61C3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/37] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dentalbohrer mit einer Nut | [2003/51] | English: | Grooved dental drill | [2003/51] | French: | Foret dentaire rainuré | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/12] | 14.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.07.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.07.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8024336U (RIESS) [A] 1* page 5, columns 18-28; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9631164 (GIBBS DAVID E [CA]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 15, line 13 - page 16, line 9 *; | [A]US5601559 (MELKER RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO0234148 (KYPHON INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5173050 | US5762639 | US5779708 | US6135769 |