EP1265322 - Apparatus and method of directing a laser beam to a thermally managed beam dump in a laser system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [2002/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nield, Scott Allen 743 East Benson Street Reading, Ohio 45215 / US | 02 /
Trusty, Robert M. 12126 Coyote Court Cincinnati, Ohio 45241 / US | 03 /
Stenton, William Conrad 1195 Sundowner Road Midland, Ontario / CA | 04 /
Gabura, James A. 1-572 William Street Midland, Ontario / CA | 05 /
Benneyworth, Edward Malcolm 462 Parkview Court Midland, Ontario / CA | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253972.0 | 07.06.2002 | [2002/50] | Priority number, date | US20010296783P | 08.06.2001 Original published format: US 296783 P | US20010877283 | 08.06.2001 Original published format: US 877283 | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1265322 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1265322 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/02, H01S5/022, A61B18/20, B23K26/06 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
H01S5/02 (EP,US);
H01S5/4025 (EP);
A61B18/22 (EP);
A61B2018/00708 (EP);
A61B2018/00779 (EP);
A61B2018/00809 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/38] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Ausrichtung eines Laserstrahls auf ein thermisch kontrolliertes Strahlempfangssystem | [2002/50] | English: | Apparatus and method of directing a laser beam to a thermally managed beam dump in a laser system | [2002/50] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour diriger un faisceau laser sur un système de décharge à faisceaux contrôlé thermiquement | [2002/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 12.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4663520 (TANAKA SHINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [Y]US4864098 (BASANESE ROBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1088523 (NIDEK KK [JP]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6231568 (LOEB MARVIN P [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * column 21, lines 7-29; figures 11,12 * |