EP1276005 - Camera and shutter device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noguchi, Osamu, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Mikami, Yuji, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | Stevens, Jason Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02254037.1 | 11.06.2002 | [2003/03] | Priority number, date | JP20010177471 | 12.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001177471 | JP20010177472 | 12.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001177472 | JP20010177473 | 12.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001177473 | JP20010235305 | 02.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001235305 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1276005 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1276005 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1276005 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03B19/04, G03B7/08 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
G03B7/003 (EP,US);
G03B7/08 (EP);
G03B7/085 (EP,US);
G03B7/095 (EP,US);
G03B9/04 (EP,US);
G03B9/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/03] | G03B19/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/19] |
Former [2003/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kamera und Verschlussvorrichtung | [2003/03] | English: | Camera and shutter device | [2003/03] | French: | Caméra et dispositif d'obturateur | [2003/03] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 14.02.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05012417.1 / EP1571487 | EP05012418.9 / EP1571488 | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.06.2007 | FR | 02.07.2007 | [2008/44] |
Former [2008/26] | GB | 11.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3641888 (DURR) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]US3772974 (SHIMOMURA J) [A] 1-37 * abstract *; | [A]US4125848 (ITO TADASHI, et al) [A] 1,15,19,30 * abstract *; | [A]US5291237 (TAGAMI SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 1-37 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1096308 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,15,19,30 * figure 1; claim 1 * |