EP1271446 - Speed trap detection and warning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Origin Technologies Limited Unit 4c, The Coda Centre, 189 Munster Road Fulham, London SW6 6AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Origin Technologies Limited Unit 4c, The Coda Centre, 189 Munster Road Fulham, london SW6 6AW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rock, Timothy Michael, Origin Technologies Limited Unit 4c, The Coda Centre, 189 Munster Road Fulham, London SW6 6AW / GB | 02 /
Groves, Mark David, Origin Technologies Limited Unit 4c, The Coda Centre, 189 Munster Road Fulham, London SW6 6AW / GB | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02254157.7 | 14.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | GB20010014843 | 18.06.2001 Original published format: GB 0114843 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271446 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/052 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G08G1/052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, NL [2003/39] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ABTAST- UND WARNSYSTEM FÜR GESCHWINDIGKEITSÜBERWACHUNGSSTELLEN | [2003/01] | English: | Speed trap detection and warning system | [2003/01] | French: | Système d'avertissement et de détection de la présence d'un appareil de contrôle de vitesse | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/46] | 16.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | For: | GB FR | Licencee: | Black Spot Interactive Limited 5 New Rookery Farm, Little London Silverstone, Northants NN12 8UP / GB | Date: | 24.06.2004 | [2004/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5485161 (VAUGHN DAVID [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, lines 15-50 * * column 7, lines 40-70 ** column 8, lines 1-5,45-55 *; | [A]EP0782118 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1,7-9,12-14 * figures 3B,3C * * column 10, paragraph 2 *; | [X]EP0789344 (SCHRIMPF WERNER [DE]) [X] 1-14 * page 2, lines 21-55 * * page 4, lines 1-55 *; | [X]US6118403 (LANG BROOK [US]) [X] 1-14 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 15-70 * * column 2, lines 30-65 *; | [X]GB2353160 (GALE NICHOLAS [GB]) [X] 1-14 * figure 1 * * page 1, lines 5-30 * * page 3, lines 1-20 *; | [X]GB2353647 (BURCH MARTIN [GB], et al) [X] 1-14 * figure 1 * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * |