EP1277604 - Dual mode regenerative suspension for an off-road vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husco International, Inc. P.O. Box 257 Waukesha, WI 53187-0257 / US | [2003/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rogala, Jeffrey A. 723 East Roland Street Oconomowoc, Wisconsin 53066 / US | 02 /
Greisbach, Eric N. 283 North Arlington Avenue North Prairie, Wisconsin 53153 / US | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | James, Michael John Gwynne, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | James, Michael John Gwynne, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02254219.5 | 17.06.2002 | [2003/04] | Priority number, date | US20010909640 | 20.07.2001 Original published format: US 909640 | [2003/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1277604 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1277604 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/015, B60G17/056, B60G13/14 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
B60G17/015 (EP,US);
B60G13/14 (EP,US);
B60G17/033 (EP,US);
B60G17/056 (EP,US);
B60G2300/082 (EP,US);
B60G2400/252 (EP,US);
B60G2800/914 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/04] | B60G13/14, B60G17/015, B60G17/056 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/08] |
Former [2003/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Energierückgewinnende Aufhängung für ein Geländefahrzeug mit zwei Betriebsarten | [2003/04] | English: | Dual mode regenerative suspension for an off-road vehicle | [2003/04] | French: | Suspension régénératrice pour un véhicule tout-terrain à double mode | [2003/04] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/37] | 01.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.01.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.01.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5193845 (YOKOTE MASATSUGU [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 65; figure 2 *; | [A]US5342023 (KURIKI NOBUHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,15* column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 52; figures 1,4,5 * |