EP1278198 - Semiconductor memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamiyama, Koichi 2-8-20 Hikarigaoka Ikoma-shi, Nara / JP | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02254461.3 | 26.06.2002 | [2003/04] | Priority number, date | JP20010192713 | 26.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001192713 | [2003/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1278198 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1278198 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1278198 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11C8/06, G11C11/418 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
G11C8/10 (EP,US);
G11C11/413 (KR);
G11C7/12 (EP,US);
G11C8/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/32] |
Former [2003/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicheranordnung | [2003/04] | English: | Semiconductor memory device | [2003/04] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire à semiconducteurs | [2003/04] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 13.05.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 10.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Request for further processing for: | 10.02.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 26.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5228003 (TOKUDA YASUNOBU [JP]) [Y] 1 * column 3; figure 1 * * columns 1-6; figures 1-5 * [A] 2-7; | [A]US5493537 (MCCLURE DAVID C [US]) [A] 1-3* column 1, paragraph 4 *; | [A]US5940337 (JIANG YONG H [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5986970 (HUNT JEFFERY SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, paragraph 5; figure 3 * |