EP1271889 - Wireless communication protocol for printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berkema, Alan C. 8803 Quartzite Circle Granite Bay, CA 95746 / US | 02 /
Morgan, Jeff 1401 Aster Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
Stoltz, Pat 13335 Bavarian Dr. San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 04 /
Fischer, Todd 1005 North 12th Street Boise, Idaho 83702 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Powell, Stephen David, et al WILLIAMS POWELL 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02254495.1 | 26.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | US20010897646 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: US 897646 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1271889 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1271889 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271889 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/19] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Funkprotokoll für die Function 'Drucken' | [2003/01] | English: | Wireless communication protocol for printing | [2003/01] | French: | Protocole de transmission radio pour la fonction 'imprimer' | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10191453 ; | [AY]WO0133365 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7,9,10 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0139]; figures 2,4,6 * [Y] 8; | [XY]WO0142894 (AXIS AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * page 12, line 30 - page 14, line 5 * * page 18, line 15 - page 21, line 11; figures 1,4,7a,b,8; claims 1-6,29-36 * [Y] 8; | EP1148424 [ ] (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [A] - ZHANG PEI ET AL, "Bluetooth - the fastest developing wireless technology", IEEE, (20000821), vol. 2, pages 1657 - 1664, XP010526681 [A] 1-10 * page 1659, column R, line 9 - page 1662, column R, line 40 * * page 1663, column R, line 1 - page 1664, column L, line 3; figures 3,6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10191453 A 19980721 (CASIO COMPUT CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |