EP1281726 - Photo-alignment materials for liquid crystal alignment film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si Kyungki-do 441-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-si, Kyungki-do 441-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Hwan Jae 388-10, Seongbok-Dong Yongin-shi kyounggi-Do 449-140 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Eun Kyung 102/1304 Woosung Apartment, Kayang-Dong Kangseo-Gu, Seoul, 157-200 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Jong Lae 3/1 145-6, Sungnae 2-Dong Kangdong-Gu, Seoul, 134-032 / KR | 04 /
Kim, Joo Young 101-1201 Saejong Apartment, Junmin-Dong Yusung-Gu, Daejun-Shi, 305-390 / KR | [2003/17] |
Former [2003/06] | 01 /
Choi, Hwan Jae 104/1402 Saejong Apartment, Junmin-Dong Yusung-Gu, Daejun-Shi, 305-390 / KR | ||
02 /
Lee, Eun Kyung 102/1304 Woosung Apartment, Kayang-Dong Kangseo-Gu, Seoul, 157-200 / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Jong Lae 3/1 145-6, Sungnae 2-Dong Kangdong-Gu, Seoul, 134-032 / KR | |||
04 /
Kim, Joo Young 101-1201 Saejong Apartment, Junmin-Dong Yusung-Gu, Daejun-Shi, 305-390 / KR | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02254853.1 | 10.07.2002 | [2003/06] | Priority number, date | KR20010046313 | 31.07.2001 Original published format: KR 2001046313 | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1281726 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/06, G02F1/1337 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
C08G73/0611 (EP,US);
C08F122/40 (KR);
G02F1/133788 (EP,US);
C09K2323/02 (EP,US);
C09K2323/025 (EP,US);
C09K2323/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/06] | Title | German: | Photo-Orientierungsmaterialien für Flüssigkristallorientierungsfilm | [2003/06] | English: | Photo-alignment materials for liquid crystal alignment film | [2003/06] | French: | Matériaux de photoalignement pour film d'alignement des cristaux liquides | [2003/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 18.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6048928 (YU HAN-SUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-5* the whole document *; | [DX]US6218501 (CHOI HWAN JAE [KR], et al) [DX] 1-5 * examples 1,2; claims 1,2 * |