EP1279492 - Decorative sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states TOKUYAMA CORPORATION 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | ||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states TOKUYAMA CORPORATION 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higashi, Nobuhiko c/o Tokuyama Corp., 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Fujimoto, Tadashi c/o Tokuyama Corp., 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Boakes, Jason Carrington, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Boakes, Jason Carrington, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2007/33] | Boakes, Jason Carrington, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York, YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2004/22] | Boakes, Jason Carrington Harrison Goddard Foote 31 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/05] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255205.3 | 25.07.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | JP20010223922 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001223922 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1279492 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1279492 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1279492 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/18, B44C5/00, C08K3/00 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
B32B5/18 (EP);
B32B29/002 (US);
B32B27/06 (US);
B32B27/20 (EP);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B44C1/10 (EP);
B44C7/00 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (US);
B32B2307/724 (US);
B32B2323/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/04] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dekorschicht | [2003/05] | English: | Decorative sheet | [2003/05] | French: | Feuille décorative | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6063472 (TAKAOKA TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 6 - line 18 * * column 2, line 50 - line 57 * * column 3, line 46 - line 61 * * column 6, line 17 - line 25 * * column 13, line 25 - line 38 ** examples 17-21 * |