EP1280042 - Privacy of data on a computer platform [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2012/02] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Proudler, Graeme John 5 Touchstone Avenue Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS34 8XQ / GB | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2003/05] | Lawrence, Richard Anthony Hewlett-Packard Limited, IP Section, Building 3, Filton Road Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255245.9 | 26.07.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | GB20010018455 | 27.07.2001 Original published format: GB 0118455 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1280042 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1280042 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
G06F21/6245 (EP,US);
G06F21/57 (EP,US);
G06F21/575 (EP,US);
G06F2211/009 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2101 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2115 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2153 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/36] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datengeheimhaltung auf einer Computerplattform | [2003/05] | English: | Privacy of data on a computer platform | [2003/05] | French: | Confidentialité des données sur une plate-forme informatique | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 01.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 18.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5361359 (TAJALLI HOMAYOON [US], et al) [X] 8-12,17-22,27,35-37 * column 8, line 33 - column 17, line 28 *; | [X]EP0825511 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-7,30-34 * page 7, column 11, line 58 - column 12, line 45; figures 5,6 *; | [XD]WO0048063 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US], et al) [XD] 1-7,30-34 * page 5, line 1 - line 22; figures 1,2 * * page 8, line 7 - line 35; figures 4,5 * * page 9, line 12 - line 18 *; | [A]EP1056010 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-7,30-34 * abstract *; | [AX]WO0073880 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US], et al) [A] 1-7,30-34 * abstract * * page 38, line 3 - page 45, line 3 * [X] 8-12,18-25,35-37; | [A]EP1085396 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-7,30-34 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0066]; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US6253193 (GINTER KARL L [US], et al) [A] 8-29,35-37* column 63, line 30 - column 199, line 35 *; | [XD] - SUN MICROSYSTEMS, Secure Computing with Java: Now and the future, (19980901), XP002481369 [XD] 1-7 * the whole document * | [X] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Chapter 3: Protected Mode Memory Management", INTEL ARCHITECTURE; SOFTWARE DEVELOPER'S MANUAL, VOLUME 3: SYSTEM PROGRAMMING, (19990101), XP009100624 [X] 1-7,30-34 * the whole document * |