EP1282302 - Imaging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takasaki, Atsushi, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2003/06] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co., 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255281.4 | 29.07.2002 | [2003/06] | Priority number, date | JP20010233471 | 01.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001233471 | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1282302 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1282302 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1282302 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/21 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
H04N1/32122 (EP,US);
H04N1/2112 (EP,US);
H04N1/00307 (EP,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2004/19] |
Former [2003/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsgerät | [2003/06] | English: | Imaging apparatus | [2003/06] | French: | Dispositif d'imagerie | [2003/06] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 27.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 03.05.2006 | [2006/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5296884 (HONDA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [X]US5754227 (FUKUOKA HIROKI [JP]) [X] 1,7,10,13 * column 3, line 1 - column 7, line 7; figures 1,2,6-8 *; | [X]EP0920179 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,7,10,13 * column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]US6269421 (NISHIMURA TAKUYA [JP]) [A] 1-13* abstract * |