EP1284110 - Contact lens package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway Suite 100 Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states Johson & Johnson Vision Care Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway, Suite 100 Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Phillips, Robert Briggs 2826 Commanche Avenue Orange Park, FL 32065-7447 / US | 02 /
Duarte, Mark Alan 3128 Cornelia Drive Jacksonville, FL 32257 / US | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255558.5 | 08.08.2002 | [2003/08] | Priority number, date | US20010925117 | 09.08.2001 Original published format: US 925117 | [2003/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284110 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1284110 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A45C11/00, B65D77/20 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
B65D85/54 (EP,US);
B65D75/30 (KR);
B65D2585/545 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/08] | A45C11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/19] |
Former [2003/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verpackung für Kontaktlinsen | [2003/08] | English: | Contact lens package | [2003/08] | French: | Etui pour lentilles de contact | [2003/08] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/12] | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/12] | Request for further processing for: | 31.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2161782 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD, et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, lines 14,15; figure - * * page 1, lines 36-50 * * page 3, lines 89-96 * * page 3, lines 126-130 *; | [DA]US5649410 (MARTIN WALLACE ANTHONY [US], et al) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]WO0035768 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [Y] 4 * figures 2,3,6 *; | [Y]EP1092645 (JOHSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE I [US]) [Y] 1-13 * column 2, lines 45-55; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 8-14 * * column 3, lines 42-48 *; | [E]EP1277416 (MENICON CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1 * column 12, lines 12-31 - column 14, lines 24-30; figure - * | by applicant | US4691820 | US5036971 | US5143660 | US5407062 | US5524419 | US5578331 | US5649410 | US5722536 |