EP1286210 - Silver salt photothermographic dry image material, an image recording method and an image forming method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Hirobumi c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo, 191-8511 / JP | 02 /
Takeyama, Toshihisa c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo, 191-8511 / JP | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Eddowes, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Eddowes, Simon, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255624.5 | 13.08.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | JP20010248893 | 20.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001248893 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1286210 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1286210 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | [2003/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1286210 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/498 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
G03C1/49881 (EP,US);
G03C1/49845 (EP,US);
G03C1/498 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03594 (EP,US);
G03C2007/3025 (EP,US);
G03C2200/39 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | GB [2004/27] |
Former [2004/12] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Photothermographisches trockenentwickelbares Silbersalzmaterial, Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren und Bildherstellungsverfahren | [2003/09] | English: | Silver salt photothermographic dry image material, an image recording method and an image forming method | [2003/09] | French: | Matériau photothermographique à base de sel d'argent pour le devéloppement à sec, procédé d'enregistrement d'images et procédé de formation d'images | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 30.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08220673 ; | [PX]JP2002023304 ; | [A]US3615526 (HUCKSTADT HARALD, et al); | [DA]EP1122593 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [DA] 5 * claim 11 *; | [PX]EP1136877 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [PX] 1-4,6,10,11 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0024] *; | [E]EP1271235 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [E] 1-11 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] ** paragraph [0052] *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 45, Database accession no. 1996-446814, XP002239100 & JPH08220673 A 19960830 (KONICA CORP) [A] * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020503), vol. 2002, no. 05, & JP2002023304 A 20020123 (KONICA CORP) [PX] 1-6,10,11 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088] * |