EP1320102 - Magnetic random access memory and method of operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Wan-jun 19-408 Cheongsil Apt., 610 Daechi-dong Gangnam-gu, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Tae-wan 4-808 Samho Apt., 354-10 Bisan 3-dong Dongan-gu, Anyang-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 03 /
Song, I-hun 509-703 Puleun Maeul Ssangyong Apt., 76 Sunae-dong Seongnam-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Sang-jin 101-1605 Kumho Apt., 827 Seojeong-dong Pyeongtaek-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 05 /
Gambino, Richard J. 148 Sycamore Circle Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255748.2 | 19.08.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | KR20010078885 | 13.12.2001 Original published format: KR 2001078885 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1320102 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1320102 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1320102 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/15, G11C11/16 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
G11C19/0808 (EP,US);
G11C11/15 (KR,US);
G11C11/16 (US);
G11C11/1659 (EP);
G11C11/1673 (EP);
G11C8/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/44] |
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Magnetischer Direktzugriffspeicher und sein Betriebsverfahren | [2003/26] | English: | Magnetic random access memory and method of operating the same | [2003/25] | French: | Mémoire magnétique à accès aléatoire et sa méthode de fonctionnement | [2003/25] |
Former [2003/25] | Magnetischer direktzugriffspeicher und sein Betriebsverfahren | Examination procedure | 05.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 05.08.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 03.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [LE]US6606263 (TANG DENNY [TW]); | [EA]US2003206434 (LEUSCHNER RAINER [US]) |