EP1286475 - CDMA receiver, path search method and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terao, Kenji.c/o Nec Corporation 7-1, shiba 5-chome Minato-ku.Tokyo / JP | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/09] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02255879.5 | 22.08.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | JP20010251753 | 22.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001251753 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1286475 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1286475 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1286475 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
H04B1/7113 (EP,US);
H04B1/7117 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/36] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | CDMA-Empfänger, Pfadsuchverfahren und Programm | [2003/09] | English: | CDMA receiver, path search method and program | [2003/09] | French: | Récepteur AMRC, procédé et programme de recherche de voie | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 30.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0924868 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 53 * * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0989685 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 44 - page 6, line 18 ** figures 1-7; claims 1-11 *; | [A] - VEJLGAARD B N ET AL, "GROUPED RAKE FINGER MANAGEMENT PRINCIPLE FOR WIDEBAND CDMA", VTC 2000-SPRING. 2000 IEEE 51ST. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. TOKYO, JAPAN, MAY 15-18, 2000, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20000515), vol. 1 OF 3. CONF. 51, ISBN 0-7803-5719-1, pages 87 - 91, XP000970585 [A] 1-8 * page 90, paragraph "IV. Grouped RAKE Finger Allocation" * * abstract *;; figures 1,4-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2000.851423 |