EP1290992 - Acetabular cup [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benoist Girard SAS 203, Boulevard de la Grande Delle B.P.8 14201 Hérouville-Saint-Clair Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states BENOIST GIRARD SAS 203, Boulevard de la Grande Delle, B.P.8 14201 Hérouville-Saint-Clair Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states BENOIST GIRARD SAS 203, Boulevard de la Grande Delle, B.P.8 14201 Hérouville-Saint-Clair Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cueille, Christophe Les Hauts Monceaux 14210 Missy / FR | 02 /
Pichon, Denis 15, avenue Georges Pompidou 35310 Mordelles / FR | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Bridge-Butler, Alan James, et al Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Bridge-Butler, Alan James, et al G.F. Redfern & Co., 7 Staple Inn, Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256257.3 | 10.09.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | GB20010022002 | 11.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0122002 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1290992 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1290992 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/34, A61L27/10, A61F2/32 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/32 (EP,US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61L27/227 (EP,US);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
A61F2/3094 (EP,US);
A61F2/36 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30324 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30433 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30448 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30451 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30929 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30968 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3611 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3625 (EP,US);
A61F2002/365 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4631 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0041 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0058 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0036 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00203 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00604 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00796 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/10 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/119 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/0072, C04B41/4501, C04B41/5133 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/4527, C04B41/4578, C04B41/4582, C04B41/5031, C04B41/522 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/11] | Title | German: | Hüftgelenkspfanne | [2003/11] | English: | Acetabular cup | [2003/11] | French: | Cupule cotyloidienne | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 22.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2006 | BE | 30.08.2006 | CY | 30.08.2006 | CZ | 30.08.2006 | EE | 30.08.2006 | FI | 30.08.2006 | NL | 30.08.2006 | PT | 30.08.2006 | SK | 30.08.2006 | TR | 30.08.2006 | LU | 10.09.2006 | IE | 11.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | BG | 30.11.2006 | DK | 30.11.2006 | SE | 30.11.2006 | GR | 01.12.2006 | ES | 11.12.2006 | [2011/46] |
Former [2009/03] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CY | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
EE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
TR | 30.08.2006 | ||
LU | 10.09.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
EE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
TR | 30.08.2006 | ||
LU | 10.09.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
EE | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 11.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SK | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
CZ | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
BG | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1334584 (CDERAVER) [Y] 4 * column 2, line 24 - line 27 *; | [Y]US4179485 (TRITTEN PAUL [FR]) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 3 - line 10 *; | [A]US4801300 (KURZE PETER [DD], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]US5658348 (ROHR JR WILLIAM L [US]) [X] 1,2,8,12 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 42 *; | [Y]US5716414 (CALDARISE SALVATORE [US]) [Y] 3,13 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 4 * * column 3, line 43 - line 47 * * column 4, line 28 - line 33 * * column 6, line 24 - line 50 *; | [XY]WO9930634 (CERAMTEC AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,10,12 * claim 1 * * page 2, line 11 - page 4, line 26 * [Y] 3,4,13; | [A]US5980574 (TAKEI TUNENORI [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document * |