EP1302750 - Communication system, method and program for navigation comprising server apparatus and terminal apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | For all designated states Increment P Corporation 1-14, Nisshincho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0024 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | ||
For all designated states Increment P Corporation 7-1, Shimomeguro 1-chome, Meguro-Ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagamune, Akira, c/o Increment P Corporation 7-1 Shimomeguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256264.9 | 10.09.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | JP20010274256 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001274256 | JP20010299822 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001299822 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1302750 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1302750 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34, G08G1/0968, G01C21/26, H04L1/18 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G08G1/096811 (EP,US);
G01C21/3667 (EP,US);
G01S19/42 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/16] | G01C21/34, G08G1/0968 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/39] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem, -verfahren und -programm zur Navigation mit Server und Endgerät | [2003/16] | English: | Communication system, method and program for navigation comprising server apparatus and terminal apparatus | [2003/16] | French: | Système, procédé et programme de communication pour la navigation comprenant serveur et terminal | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 05.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/02] | 29.10.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/02] | Appeal following examination | 26.02.2007 | Appeal received No. T0828/07 | 27.04.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.12.2009 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 04.12.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 29.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.11.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000207689 ; | [A]WO9845823 (DUROCHER JEAN MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 12, lines 14-21 *; | [A]WO0101370 (TELIA AB [SE]) [A] 1-17* page 8, lines 16-29 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000207689 A 20000728 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0054] * * paragraph [0060] * * An automatic translation can be found on the IPDL JPO internet site * | [A] - ZORZI M ET AL, "ARQ error control for fading mobile radio channels", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, MAY 1997, IEEE, USA, vol. 46, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 445 - 455, XP002259815 [A] 1-17 * page 445, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 447, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/25.580783 |