EP1365392 - Optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Kyung-geun 112-1002 Sibeom Hanshin Apt. 87 Seohyun-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Ahn, Yong-jin 107-303 Wooseong Apt. 154-2, Yangjae-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Park, In-sik 615-801 Shinnamushil 967-2 Youngtong 2-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Seong-sue 203-404 Kumho Samsung Raemian Apt. 1500 Geumho-dong 1-ka Seongdong-gu Seoul / KR | 05 /
Yoon, Du-seop 110-1901 LG Samick Apt. 377 Homaeshil-dong Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Fearnside, Andrew Simon, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Fearnside, Andrew Simon, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2006/34] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2003/48] | Chugg, David John, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256278.9 | 11.09.2002 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | KR20020027928 | 20.05.2002 Original published format: KR 2002027928 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1365392 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1365392 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007, G11B7/0055 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
G11B7/00736 (EP);
G11B7/004 (KR);
G11B2007/0006 (EP);
G11B2007/0013 (EP);
G11B7/0055 (EP);
G11B7/0062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/48] | Title | German: | Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2003/48] | English: | Optical recording medium | [2003/48] | French: | Support d'enregistrement optique | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 14.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/17] | 03.12.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0405610 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5291470 (NISHIUCHI KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP1168315 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 3,9,11,18 * paragraphs [0019] , [0023] , [0027] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] *; | [A]US2002003762 (DEKKER MARTIJN JEROEN [NL]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [E]EP1339048 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 4-7,12-15,19-22 * figure 6 *; | [X] - ECMA: STANDARDIZING INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, "Standard ECMA-330:120 mm (4,7 Gbytes per side) and 80 mm (1,46 Gbytes per side) DVD Rewritable Disk (DVD-RAM)", STANDARD ECMA, (200112), page 128, XP002310606 [X] 1-22 * paragraph [16.2.6.1] * * table 7 * * Annex H * | [A] - ECMA: STANDARDIZING INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, "Standard ECMA-267, 3nd edition: 120 mm DVD - Read-Only Disk", STANDARD ECMA-267, (200104), no. 272, pages 1 - 86, XP002186785 [A] 16 * figure 25 * | Examination | US5732062 | JPH11283249 | JP2000123367 | US6396792 | US6483791 |