EP1401101 - Transistor photoelectric conversion drive circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Change - representative | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Tai-Her No. 59, Chung Hsing 8 Street Si-Hu Town Dzan-Hwa / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Yang, Tai-Her No. 59, Chung Hsing 8 Street Si-Hu Town, Dzan-Hwa / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2004/13] | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256551.9 | 20.09.2002 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1401101 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/785 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
H03K17/785 (EP,US);
H03K17/04123 (EP,US);
H03K17/0406 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/13] | Title | German: | Transistor-Treiberschaltung mit photoelektrischer Umwandlung | [2004/13] | English: | Transistor photoelectric conversion drive circuit | [2004/13] | French: | Circuit d'attaque de transistor à conversion photoélectrique | [2004/13] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 29.07.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/51] | 05.08.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP10171116.6 / EP2276174 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS59146225 ; | [XA]US4716513 (ITO TOMOTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,2,24 * column 1, line 11 - line 68; figure 1 * [A] 7-23; | [XAY]US4754175 (KOBAYASHI SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,24 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 52; figures 1,2 * [A] 7-23 [Y] 3-6; | [A]GB2288090 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-24* page 13, paragraph L - page 21; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0869612 (YANG TAI HER [TW]) [Y] 3-6 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 10; figure 1 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841218), vol. 008, no. 277, Database accession no. (E - 285), & JP59146225 A 19840822 (MITSUBISHI DENKI KK) [X] 1,2,24 * abstract * [A] 7-23 |