EP1404046 - Equalizer with two space-time filters and with a selector for choosing the filter with the best symbol estimate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuzminskiy, Alexandr 8 Worlidge Drive, Shaw Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 9RB / GB | 02 /
Papadias, Constantinos 794 W. Broad Street Westfield, Union New Jersey 07090 / US | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2004/14] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologies UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256711.9 | 26.09.2002 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404046 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1404046 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/06, H04B7/08, H04L25/03 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
H04L25/03038 (EP,US);
H04L1/06 (EP,US);
H04B7/082 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03726 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/52] |
Former [2004/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entzerrer mit zwei Raum-Zeit Filtern und mit einem Selektor zum Wählen des Filters mit der besten Symbolschätzung | [2004/14] | English: | Equalizer with two space-time filters and with a selector for choosing the filter with the best symbol estimate | [2004/14] | French: | Egaliseur avec deux filtres espace-temps et avec un selecteur pour choisir le filtre avec la meilleure estimation de symbole | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 16.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1100211 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 18 * * column 4, line 32 - line 52 * * figure 3 *; | [A]GB2357938 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI]) [A] 1-9 * page 10, line 3 - page 11, line 21 ** figure 3 *; | [A]EP1152549 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 23 * * figure 1 * |