EP1302205 - Controlled release formulations of macrolide citrate salts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ind-Swift Limited 781 Industrial Area, Phase II Chandigarh - 160 002 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Ind-Swift Limited 781 Industrial Area, Phase II Chandigarh - 160 002 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wadhwa, Hardeep 408, Shakti Apartments, Sector - 14 Panchkula, Haryana / IN | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Bates, Philip Ian Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02256823.2 | 01.10.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | IN1018DEL2001 | 01.10.2001 Original published format: IN DE20011018 | IN1019DEL2001 | 01.10.2001 Original published format: IN DE20011019 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302205 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302205 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7048, A61K9/22 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/1694 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/16] | A61K31/7048 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/16] | Title | German: | Makrolidcitrat-haltige Formulierungen mit kontrollierter Freisetzung | [2003/16] | English: | Controlled release formulations of macrolide citrate salts | [2003/16] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique à libération contrôlée comprenant citrate de macrolide | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.03.2005 | CH | 30.03.2005 | EE | 30.03.2005 | FI | 30.03.2005 | IT | 30.03.2005 | LI | 30.03.2005 | NL | 30.03.2005 | SK | 30.03.2005 | SE | 30.06.2005 | ES | 11.07.2005 | CY | 01.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/38] | BE | 30.03.2005 | |
CH | 30.03.2005 | ||
EE | 30.03.2005 | ||
FI | 30.03.2005 | ||
IT | 30.03.2005 | ||
LI | 30.03.2005 | ||
NL | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
CY | 01.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BE | 30.03.2005 | |
CH | 30.03.2005 | ||
EE | 30.03.2005 | ||
FI | 30.03.2005 | ||
LI | 30.03.2005 | ||
NL | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
CY | 01.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | BE | 30.03.2005 | |
CH | 30.03.2005 | ||
EE | 30.03.2005 | ||
FI | 30.03.2005 | ||
LI | 30.03.2005 | ||
NL | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | BE | 30.03.2005 | |
CH | 30.03.2005 | ||
FI | 30.03.2005 | ||
LI | 30.03.2005 | ||
NL | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BE | 30.03.2005 | |
CH | 30.03.2005 | ||
FI | 30.03.2005 | ||
LI | 30.03.2005 | ||
NL | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
ES | 11.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/01] | BE | 30.03.2005 | |
FI | 30.03.2005 | ||
SK | 30.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 30.03.2005 | |
FI | 30.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 30.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]US5705190 (BROAD NEVILLE W [GB], et al) [XD] 1-4,6,9-11 * column 3, line 3 - line 25 * * column 4, line 35 - line 52 * * column 5, line 32 - line 48 * * table 1 * [Y] 1-26; | [Y]WO0006531 (NICOX SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-26* example 19 *; | [Y] - DUTTA S.K. ET AL., "Preparation of water-soluble salts of erythromycin and study of some of their properties", INDIAN DRUGS, (1980), vol. 17, no. 11, pages 354 - 356, XP001083744 [Y] 1-26 * page 354, column 2, paragraph 2 * * table 2 * |