EP1304602 - Fiber removal device for image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2006/34] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chappell, James M. 743 Hailey Drive Webster, New York 14580 / US | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257098.0 | 14.10.2002 | [2003/17] | Priority number, date | US20010981179 | 16.10.2001 Original published format: US 981179 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1304602 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1304602 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/00 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
G03G21/0052 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0621 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0643 (EP,US);
G03G2221/0005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/03] |
Former [2003/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Faserentfernungseinrichtung für Bildformungsapparat | [2003/17] | English: | Fiber removal device for image forming apparatus | [2003/17] | French: | Dispositif d'enlevement de fibres pour appareil de formation d'image | [2003/17] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Request for further processing for: | 10.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 10.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11327396 ; | [A]GB1382465 (KALLE AG) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 31; figures 1-3; claims 1,7,12 *; | [A]US4026701 (TILL HENRY R, et al) [A] 1-7* column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 8; figures 2,3,4A *; | [X]EP0532306 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, line 46 - column 8, line 8; figures 1,3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11327396 A 19991126 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [X] 1-4,6,7 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036]; figures 4,5 * |