EP1318188 - Dispersants and lubricating oil compositions containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states Infineum International Limited P.O. Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bell, Ian Alexander Weston 5 Knollys Close Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 1XN / GB | 02 /
Emert, Jacob 484 Argyle Road Brooklyn, New York 11218 / US | 03 /
Fellows, Ray 35 Calais Dene Bampton, Oxfordshire OX18 2NR / GB | 04 /
Gutierrez, Antonio 22 Tar Heels Road Mercerville, New Jersey 08619 / US | 05 /
Robson, Robert 4 Park Road Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 1DS / GB | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Mansell, Keith Rodney, et al Infineum UK Ltd. Law Department P.O. Box 1 Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Mansell, Keith Rodney, et al Infineum UK Ltd, Law Department, P.O. Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257526.0 | 30.10.2002 | [2003/24] | Priority number, date | US20010008628 | 06.12.2001 Original published format: US 8628 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1318188 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C10M133/56, C10M139/00, C10M169/04 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
C10M133/56 (EP,US);
C10M139/00 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10N2030/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/74 (EP,US);
C10N2040/253 (EP,US);
C10N2070/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/24] | C10M133/56, C10M139/00, C10M169/04, // (C10M169/04, 133:56, 139:00, 135:18, 159:20, 129:54),(C10N30/04, 40:25, 60:14) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/24] | Title | German: | Dispergiermittel und Dispergiermittel enthaltende Schmieröle | [2003/24] | English: | Dispersants and lubricating oil compositions containing same | [2003/24] | French: | Agents dispersants et composition lubrifiante les comportant | [2003/24] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 15.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/34] | 27.04.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/34] | Appeal following examination | 17.04.2007 | Appeal received No. T0714/07 | 17.04.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.04.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 27.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4234435 (MEINHARDT NORMAN A, et al) [AD] 1-19 * column 4, line 65 - column 15, line 35 ** example - *; | [A]US5407591 (EMERT JACOB [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 4, line 12 - column 8, line 31 * * column 34, line 5 - line 15 * * example 13 *; | [X]EP0976814 (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10-13,15,17 * page 11, line 50 - page 15, line 51 * * examples A19,A24,A26 *; | [A]US6051537 (EMERT JACOB [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 63 * * column 9, line 13 - column 10, line 18 * * column 23, line 55 - column 24, line 9 * * example - * |