EP1376028 - Solar energy collecting device with a thermal conductor, and water heating apparatus using the solar energy collecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orra Corporation 2975 Scott Blvd., Suite 205 Santa Clara San Diego, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Orra Corporation 2975 Scott Blvd., Suite 205 Santa Clara, San Diego, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luo, Chin-Kuang 5F, No. 56, Min-Chuan Rd. Chung Dist., Taichung City / TW | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Hector, Annabel Mary, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Hector, Annabel Mary, et al D Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257537.7 | 30.10.2002 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | CN21204485 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: CN 21204485 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1376028 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/34, F28F13/00 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
F28F13/00 (EP,US);
F24S60/30 (EP,US);
F24S70/30 (EP);
F28F2013/001 (EP);
Y02E10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sonnenkollektor mit thermischem Leiter und Wassererhitzer mit einem solchen Sonnenkollektor | [2004/01] | English: | Solar energy collecting device with a thermal conductor, and water heating apparatus using the solar energy collecting device | [2004/01] | French: | Collecteur solaire avec un conducteur thermique et chauffe-eau utilisant ce collecteur solaire | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |