EP1310947 - Optical sensor to recording head alignment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 501 Sycamore Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Basra, Vijay K. 66 Fairchild Drive Reading, Massachusetts 01867 / US | 02 /
Bellesis, George 59 Heather Circle Jefferson, Massachusetts 01522 / US | 03 /
Guglielmo, Leo 83 Sanchez Avenue Ormond Beach, Florida 32174 / US | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257629.2 | 04.11.2002 | [2003/20] | Priority number, date | US20010037083 | 07.11.2001 Original published format: US 37083 | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1310947 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/596 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
G11B5/584 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Optischer Sensor zum Gleichlauf eines Aufnahmekopfs | [2003/20] | English: | Optical sensor to recording head alignment | [2003/20] | French: | Détecteur optique pour l'alignement d'une tête d 'enregistrement | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 01.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/48] | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |