EP1418286 - Method for the production of a liner for a panel, liner, and panel provided with such a liner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corus Technology BV P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [2004/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lammy, Felicity Emma 218 Claremont, Malpas Newport NP20 GPR / GB | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Kruit, Jan, et al Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. Group Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Kruit, J., Ir., et al Corus Technology BV Corus Intellectual Property Department PO Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | ||
Former [2004/20] | Townsend, Victoria Jayne, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP, The Gables, Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257661.5 | 05.11.2002 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1418286 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/292 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
E04C2/292 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Verkleidung für ein Paneel, Verkleidung und Paneel mit einer solchen Verkleidung | [2004/20] | English: | Method for the production of a liner for a panel, liner, and panel provided with such a liner | [2004/20] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un revêtement pour un panneau, revêtement et panneau avec revêtement | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 06.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2142670 (HOESCH WERKE AG) [X] 1,2,7-9,14 * page 1, column 2, line 119 - page 2, column 1, line 55; figures 1,2 * [A] 10; | [X]GB2325678 (KINGSPAN RES & DEV LTD [IE]) [X] 1,2,4,11,12,17,18 * page 4, line 27 - page 7, line 17; figures 1-3,5,8,9 *; | [A]EP0967343 (THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG [DE]) [A] 15* figures 1,3 * | by applicant | GB2142670 | GB2325678 |