EP1314855 - Gas turbine engine aerofoil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dailey, Geoffrey Mathew The Bower, Repton Road Newton Solney, Derbyshire DE15 0SG / GB | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc Patents Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [2009/40] |
Former [2003/22] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257681.3 | 06.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | GB20010027902 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: GB 0127902 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1314855 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1314855 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/20] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaufel für ein Gasturbinentriebwerk | [2003/22] | English: | Gas turbine engine aerofoil | [2003/22] | French: | Aube pour turbine à gaz | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 11.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58170801 ; | [X]US5246340 (WINSTANLEY DAVID K [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, lines 12-57 - column 4, lines 7-12; figures 3,5 * * column 6, lines 1-30 *; | [A]US5387085 (THOMAS JR THEODORE T [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 5, lines 30-55; figure 3 *; | [A]US5660524 (LEE CHING-PANG [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2 - column 3; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0971095 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6* abstract *; | [X]FR2798422 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-6 * pages 4-9; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840111), vol. 008, no. 005, Database accession no. (M - 267), & JP58170801 A 19831007 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * |