EP1315249 - Connector position assurance apparatus, methods and articles of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Corporation 2901 Fulling Mill Road Middletown, PA 17057-3163 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Corporation 2901 Fulling Mill Road Middletown, Pennsylvania 17057 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greiner, Robert David 3972 Elizabeth Glen Way Jamestown, NC 27282 / US | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 19 South End Kensington, London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257957.7 | 19.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | US20010991719 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: US 991719 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1315249 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1315249 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629, H01R13/627, H01R13/639 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
H01R13/6272 (EP,US);
H01R13/627 (KR);
H01R13/6395 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/22] | H01R13/629 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/40] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stellungssicherheitseinrichtung für Verbinder, Verfahren und Vorrichtngen für die Herstellung | [2003/22] | English: | Connector position assurance apparatus, methods and articles of manufacture | [2003/22] | French: | Dispositif d'assurance de position de connecteur, méthodes et dispositifs de fabrication | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4370013 (NIITSU MITSUGI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11,14* the whole document *; | [X]EP0709928 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [X] 1-5,7-11,14 * the whole document *; | [X]US6261116 (CERU SCOTT JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * |