EP1421899 - Devices for physiological fluid sampling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/22] | Devices for physiological fluid sampling and methods of using the same | ||
[2007/13] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeScan, Inc. 1000 Gibraltar Drive, Mail Stop 3D Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Lifescan, Inc. 1000 Gibraltar Drive, Mail Stop 3D Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matzinger, David 580 Wallea Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 02 /
Quaraishi, Kahlid R. 756 San Pablo Avenue Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258029.4 | 21.11.2002 | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1421899 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/026, A61B5/103 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
A61B5/441 (EP,US);
G01N33/487 (KR);
A61B10/0045 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/0261 (EP,US);
A61B5/14514 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/15003 (EP,US);
A61B5/150076 (EP,US);
A61B5/150083 (EP,US);
A61B5/150305 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150748 (EP,US);
A61B5/150954 (EP,US);
A61B5/15107 (EP,US);
A61B5/15117 (EP,US);
A61B5/1519 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/489 (EP,US);
G01N33/49 (EP,US);
G01N33/80 (EP,US);
A61B2010/008 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00057 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/15109 (EP,US);
A61B5/15113 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/22] | Title | German: | Geräte zur Entnahme physiologischer Flüssigkeiten | [2007/13] | English: | Devices for physiological fluid sampling | [2007/13] | French: | Dispositif d'échantillonnage de fluides physiologiques | [2007/13] |
Former [2004/22] | Geräte und Verfahren zur Entnahme physiologischer Flüssigkeiten | ||
Former [2004/22] | Devices for physiological fluid sampling and methods of using the same | ||
Former [2004/22] | Dispositif et procedé d'échantillonnage de fluides physiologiques | Examination procedure | 05.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/01] | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5261409 (DARDEL ERIC [CH]) [X] 1,3,6 * column 1, line 5 - line 20 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,7-15; | [XY]US5519208 (ESPARZA JOEL [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 34 * [Y] 2,3,6-15; | [Y]WO9820794 (MOOR INSTR LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 3,6,7 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]US5972294 (SMITH JOHN L [US], et al) [Y] 8-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - line 13 *; | [Y]DE19818532 (UNIV DRESDEN TECH [DE]) [Y] 12* claim 1 *; | [Y]US6104939 (GRONER WARREN [US], et al) [Y] 11,13-15 * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 53 *; | [X]US6178340 (SVETLIZA EDUARDO [IL]) [X] 1,4,5,7 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 9 * * column 4, line 41 - line 64 *; | [X]US6464646 (SHALOM MOSHE [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 37 - line 54 * | by applicant | US4224125 | US4545382 | US5266179 | WO9718465 | US5846486 | WO9949307 | US5968836 | US5972294 |