EP1316595 - Moisture-curing adhesives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | ||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shah, Pankaj 852 Woodmar Drive Crystal Lake, Illinois 60014 / US | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2003/23] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Operations Patent Dept. Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258319.9 | 03.12.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | US20010334433P | 03.12.2001 Original published format: US 334433 P | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1316595 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316595 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1316595 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/06, C08G18/12, C08K3/36, C09J11/04 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
C09J11/04 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/4018 (EP,US);
C08G18/4202 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C09J5/06 (EP,US);
C08G2170/20 (EP,US);
C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/307 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/09] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Feuchtigkeitshärtbare Klebstoffe | [2003/23] | English: | Moisture-curing adhesives | [2003/23] | French: | Adhésifs durcissables par l'humidité | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 16.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.11.2008
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/52] | 18.12.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.06.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.10.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.06.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0386879 (BOSTIK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,3-5 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 8; claims 1-8 *; | [A]DE4234273 (SUNSTAR ENGINEERING INC [JP]) [A] 1* page 2, line 52 - page 4, line 61; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE19512551 (SCHELLER GEORG [DE]) [A] 1,3 * page 1, line 9 - line 38 * * page 3, line 6 - line 24; claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0764670 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,3-5 * page 3, line 12 - page 7, line 56; claims 1,2 * | Opposition | WO9623845 | EP0827994 |