EP1323491 - Laser processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imakado, Masayuki c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Matsushita, Naohisa c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/48] |
Former [2011/28] | 01 /
Imakado, Masayuki c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Matsushita, Naohisa c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
Former [2003/27] | 01 /
Imakado, Masayuki, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Matsushita, Naohisa, Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael Ian, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Williams, Michael Ian, et al Haseltine Lake Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258966.7 | 24.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | JP20010400309 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001400309 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1323491 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1323491 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323491 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/073 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
B23K26/073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/01] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Laserbearbeitungsvorrichtung | [2003/27] | English: | Laser processing device | [2003/27] | French: | Dispositif de traitement par laser | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 14.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.01.2012 | GB | 29.02.2012 | [2013/10] |
Former [2013/07] | FR | 30.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000263267 ; | [X]US5245682 (ORTIZ JR ANGEL L [US]) [X] 1,2,6-9* abstract *; | [X]US5370643 (KRIVOSHLYKOV SERGEI G [RU], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,9 * abstract *; | [X]US5815626 (KUBA KAZUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * figures 10-16,19,21-25,32 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000263267 A 20000926 (SUMITOMO HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,2,6,8,9 * abstract * | by applicant | US5815626 |