EP1434128 - Plug-and-play interconnection architecture and method with in-device storage module in peripheral device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neodio Technologies Corporation 14F-1 No: 176 Chien-Yi Road, Chung-Ho Taipei Hsien Taipei / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Neodio Technologies Corporation 14F-1 No: 176 Chien-Yi Road, Chung-Ho Taipei Hsien, Taipei / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Su, Shih Chieh 14F-1 No: 176 Chien-Yi Road, Chung-Ho Taipei Hsien, Taipei / TW | 02 /
Lin, Chih-Lung 14F-1 No: 176 Chien-Yi Road, Chung-Ho Taipei Hsien, Taipei / TW | 03 /
Wang, Jia Lung 14F-1 No: 176 Chien-Yi Road, Chung-Ho Taipei Hsien, Taipei / TW | 04 /
Chang, Hsiao Te 14F-1 No: 176 Chien-Yi Road, Chung-Ho Taipei Hsien, Taipei / TW | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258981.6 | 27.12.2002 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434128 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
G06F9/4415 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/12] |
Former [2004/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plug and Play Verbindungsarchitektur und Verfahren mit integriertem Speichermodul in einem Peripheriegerät | [2004/27] | English: | Plug-and-play interconnection architecture and method with in-device storage module in peripheral device | [2004/27] | French: | Architecture d'interconnexion prête-a-l'emploi et méthode module mémoire interne dans un dispositif periphérique | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/41] | 27.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.02.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.02.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6009480 (PLESO MARK F [US]) [X] 1-24 * column 10, line 63 - column 11, line 53 *; | [X]US6138178 (WATANABE MIKIO [JP]) [X] 1-24 * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line L *; | [X]WO0197025 (SILICOM LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-24* page 6, line 11 - page 7, line L *; | [X]EP1179783 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-24 * column 4, line 54 - column 7, line 5 * |