EP1324399 - Method for manufacturing a light-emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/27] | Light-emitting device and method for manufacturing the same | ||
[2011/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2011/32] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asakawa, Koji c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fujimoto, Akira c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sugiyama, Hitoshi c/o Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ohashi, Kenichi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Suzuki, Keiji c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Tonotani, Junichi c/o Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02258982.4 | 27.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | JP20010402004 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001402004 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1324399 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1324399 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1324399 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L33/22, // H01L21/027 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
H01L33/22 (EP,US);
H01L21/0271 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/27] | H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/39] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer lichtemittierenden Vorrichtung | [2011/13] | English: | Method for manufacturing a light-emitting device | [2011/13] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif émetteur de lumière | [2011/13] |
Former [2003/27] | Lichtemittierende Vorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [2003/27] | Light-emitting device and method for manufacturing the same | ||
Former [2003/27] | Dispositif émetteur de lumière et procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 15.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 14.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10015857.5 / EP2306527 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/19] |
Former [2012/46] | GB | 27.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0977277 (IMEC INTER UNI MICRO ELECTR [BE], et al) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0058] - [0062] - [0072]; figures 12,13a-d,14a-b,15,16 *; | [DA]JP2001100419 (TOSHIBA CORP) [DA] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0039] , [0052] , [0061] - [0064]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO0141225 (CREE LIGHTING CO [US]) [A] 13 * page 1, lines 10-13 * * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 26 ** page 18, line 31 - page 20, line 23; figures 10-13 *; | [X] - SCHNITZER I ET AL, "30% EXTERNAL QUANTUM EFFICIENCY FROM SURFACE TEXTURED, THIN-FILM LIGHT-EMITTING DIODES", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19931018), vol. 63, no. 16, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2174 - 2176, XP000404433 [X] 14 * abstract * * page 2174, column 2, line 23 - page 2175, column 1, line 18; figures 1,2 * * page 2176, column 1, lines 15-30; figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.110575 | [A] - DECKMAN H W ET AL, "NATURAL LITHOGRAPHY", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19820815), vol. 41, no. 4, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 377 - 379, XP000955278 [A] 14 * page 377, column 1, lines 11-25 * * page 378, column 2, lines 21-29; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.93501 | [A] - HARRISON CHRISTOPHER ET AL, "Lithography with a mask of block copolymer microstructures", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B: MICROELECTRONICSPROCESSING AND PHENOMENA, AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19980301), vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 544 - 552, XP012006671 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 544, column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 10; figures 1a-b * * page 544, column 2, line 30 - page 545, column 1, line 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.589860 |