EP1236599 - Door-harness wiring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | 12.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Akio Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP | 02 /
Fukumoto, Seiji Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Uchida, Kenji, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Uchida, Kenji, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot et Autres Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02290388.4 | 18.02.2002 | [2002/36] | Priority number, date | JP20010044967 | 21.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001044967 | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1236599 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/04, B60R16/02 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
B60J5/0416 (EP,US);
B60R16/0207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2003/21] |
Former [2002/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verlegungssystem für einen Tür-Kabelbaum | [2002/36] | English: | Door-harness wiring system | [2002/36] | French: | Système de montage d'un faisceau de cables pour portière | [2002/36] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 17.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/05] | 29.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000016194 ; | [Y]JPH1081180 ; | [A]JPH1024778 ; | [A]JPH09121431 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000016194 A 20000118 (FUJIKURA LTD) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10081180 A 19980331 (HARNESS SOGO GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO:KK;SUMITOMO WIRING SYST LTD; SUMITOMO E) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10024778 A 19980127 (HARNESS SOGO GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO:KK;SUMITOMO WIRING SYST LTD; SUMITOMO E) [A] 3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09121431 A 19970506 (HARNESS SOGO GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO:KK;SUMITOMO WIRING SYST LTD; SUMITOMO E) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |