EP1348954 - Apparatus and method for acoustically investigating a borehole by using a phased array sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER 42, rue Saint-Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Froelich, Benoit 26bis Chemin du Gaillon 78160 Marly-le-Roi / FR | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Weihs, Bruno Konrad Osha Liang 121, Avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Weihs, Bruno Rosenthal & Osha S.A.R.L. 121, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02290776.0 | 28.03.2002 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1348954 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/10, G01V1/52, B06B1/06, E21B47/10 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
B06B1/0633 (EP);
G01N29/024 (EP);
G01N29/2456 (EP);
G01N29/262 (EP);
G01N29/341 (EP);
G01V1/52 (EP);
G01N2291/044 (EP);
G01N2291/106 (EP);
G01S15/892 (EP);
G01S15/8925 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/26] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur akustischen Untersuchung eines Bohrlochs mit Hilfe eines phasengesteuerten Ultraschall-Gruppenwandlers | [2003/40] | English: | Apparatus and method for acoustically investigating a borehole by using a phased array sensor | [2003/40] | French: | Appareil et procede pour examiner acoustiquement un trou de forage par un réseau pilote en phase | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 29.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.05.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0513718 (CHEVRON RES & TECH [US]) [X] 1,4,6-9,13 * abstract * * page 4, line 23 - line 37 * * page 2, line 9 - line 11 * [A] 2,3,5,10; | [XA]US5367911 (JEWELL ANDREW D [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,13 * abstract * * column 11, line 7 - column 12, line 49 * [A] 10,11; | [XA]GB2305245 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 3 - paragraph L * [A] 2-10,13; | [XA]US5640371 (SCHMIDT MATHEW G [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 64 - line 67 * * column 4, lines 51-61 * * column 7, line 26 - line 48 * * column 11, line 40 - line 47 * * column 18, line 66 - column 19, line 57 * [A] 10,11; | [A]US6188643 (LIANG KENNETH K [US], et al) [A] 12 * abstract ** column 7, line 29 - line 48 *; | [XA]WO0173478 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 8, line 2 * * page 10, paragraph 4 * [A] 10,12; | [XA] - VOS H C L ET AL, "An ultrasonic circular array transducer for pipeline and borehole inspection", ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, IEEE, (1988), pages 659 - 661, XP010075531 [X] 1 * page 659, column L, paragraphs 1,3 * * page 659, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 661; figure 4 * [A] 2-10,13 | [T] - POGUET J ET AL, "Phased Array technology: concepts, probes and applications", NDT.NET, vol. 7, no. 5, (20020501), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.ndt.net/article/v07n05/poguet/poguet.htm, (20020909), XP002212809 [T] 1-10,13 * the whole document * | [A] - V. DEUTSCH, M. PLATTE, M. VOGT, Ultraschallprüfung, BERLIN, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1997), XP002227724 [A] 11 * page 319, paragraph L - page 321; figures 7.10-7.12 * |