EP1349238 - Encapsulating device and battery pack including such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics N.V. Tower B, 17th Floor, World Trade Center, Strawinskylaan 1725 1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics N.V. Tower B, 17th Floor, World Trade Center, Strawinskylaan 1725 1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dorren, Bastiaan Hendrik Peter Landsroemlaan 11 bus 1 1081 Brussel / BE | 02 /
Blansaer, Eddy Langerbruggestraat 15 9041 Oostakker / BE | 03 /
van den Bossche, Luc Jozef Louise Dries 45 9280 Lebbeke / BE | 04 /
Wojciechowski, Dominique Rue Chapelle Planchon 19 7912 Saint-Sauveur / BE | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goen & Co., Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 02290807.3 | 29.03.2002 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1349238 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/02 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
H01R4/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/26] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verkapselung und Batterieeinrichtung mit solcher Verkapselung | [2003/40] | English: | Encapsulating device and battery pack including such a device | [2003/40] | French: | Dispositif d'encapsulage et assemblage de batterie avec un tel dispositif | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 02.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 09.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5432017 (HASSEMER BRIAN J [US], et al); | [A]EP0862230 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10 * page 6, line 7 - page 8, line 7 *; | [A]US5978230 (DANDO ROSS S [US], et al); | [X]US6356448 (DIBENE II JOSEPH TED [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 8, line 23 - line 29; figure A * | Examination | - Merriam-Webster Collegiate Dictionary, Springfield, Massachusetts, U.S.A., Merriam-Webster Inc., (1989), ISBN 0-87779-508-8 |