EP1321961 - Flat type color cathode ray tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG.PHILIPS DISPLAYS KOREA CO., LTD. 184, KONGDAN-DONG KUMI-SHI KYONGSANGBUK-DO / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states LG.PHILIPS DISPLAYS KOREA CO., LTD. 184, KONGDAN-DONG KUMI-SHI, KYONGSANGBUK-DO / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Hoon 184 Kongdan-Dong, Kumi Kyeongsangbuk-Do / KR | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Loisel, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Loisel, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/26] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291381.8 | 05.06.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | KR20010081413 | 19.12.2001 Original published format: KR 2001081413 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1321961 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1321961 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J31/12, H01J29/07, H01J29/86 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
H01J29/07 (EP,US);
H01J29/02 (KR);
H01J29/076 (EP,US);
H01J29/86 (EP,US);
H01J2229/075 (EP,US);
H01J2229/0794 (EP,US);
H01J2229/8613 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/13] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Flache Farbkathodenstrahlröhre | [2003/26] | English: | Flat type color cathode ray tube | [2003/26] | French: | Tube à rayons cathodiques couleur de type plat | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/29] | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0448401 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [Y]US5917273 (WATANABE MITSURU [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 43 *; | [A]US6160344 (CHO YOON-HYOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1154458 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0083]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0055] *; | [A]EP1160823 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |