EP1267510 - Multi-wavelength optical modulation circuit and wavelength-division multiplexed optical signal transmitter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/40] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kani, Jun-Ichi, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Araya, Katsuhiro, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takachio, Noboru, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Akimoto, Koji, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Teshima, Mitsuhiro, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Fujiwara, Masamichi, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Suzuki, Hiroo, c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Kawai, Shingo, c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 09 /
Iwatsuki, Katsumi, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2007/22] |
Former [2002/51] | 01 /
Kani, Jun-Ichi, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Araya, Katsuhiro, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Takachio, Noboru, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Akimoto, Koji, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Teshima, Mitsuhiro, NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
06 /
Fujiwara, Masamichi, NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
07 /
Suzuki, Hiroo, NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
08 /
Kawai, Shingo, NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | |||
09 /
Iwatsuki, Katsumi, c/o NTT Intell. Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291444.4 | 11.06.2002 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | JP20010179167 | 13.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001179167 | JP20010179168 | 13.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001179168 | JP20010385798 | 19.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001385798 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1267510 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1267510 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1267510 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
H04J14/02 (EP,US);
H04B10/506 (EP,US);
H04J14/0221 (EP,US);
H04J14/0246 (EP,US);
H04J14/025 (EP,US);
H04J14/0297 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/47] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mehrwellenlängen optische Modulationsvorrichtung und Wellenlängenmultiplexierter optischer Signalsender | [2002/51] | English: | Multi-wavelength optical modulation circuit and wavelength-division multiplexed optical signal transmitter | [2002/51] | French: | Circuit de modulation optique à longueurs d'ondes multiples et emetteur de signaux optique à multiplexage en longueurs d'ondes | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 21.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 30.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1043859 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,14 * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0098] ** figure 13 *; | [AD] - TAKACHIO N ET AL, "Wide area gigabit access network based on 12.5 GHz spaced 256 channel super-dense WDM technologies", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (20010301), vol. 37, no. 5, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 309 - 311, XP006016306 [AD] 1-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20010184 |