EP1279428 - Process and device for introducing a liquid-vapour mixture in radial distribution into a cylindrical distillation column [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE MARKETING Tour Total 24 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE MARKETING 24 cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION S.A. Tour Total, 24 cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vedrine, Denis 44, Allée Martin Luther King 76600 Le Havre / FR | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Roger, Walter, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Roger, Walter, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/05] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02291805.6 | 17.07.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | FR20010009993 | 26.07.2001 Original published format: FR 0109993 | [2003/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1279428 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/00, B01D3/32 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
B01D3/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur radial verteilten Zuführung einer flüssig-dampfförmigen Mischung in eine zylindrische Destillationskolonne | [2003/05] | English: | Process and device for introducing a liquid-vapour mixture in radial distribution into a cylindrical distillation column | [2003/05] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'introduction d'un mélange liquide-vapeur dans une colonne de distillation cylindrique à alimentation radiale | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 28.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1483111 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1794104 (TICONA POLYMERWERKE GMBH) [A] 2,8* figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2259025 (PALADON [GB]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5516465 (YEOMAN NEIL [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 21,22; claim 1 * |