EP1288444 - Fixing stator elements in a turbomachine casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states SNECMA 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Snecma Moteurs 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crozet, François Les Rives de l'Yerres BT C2, rue P. de Coubertin 91330 Yerres / FR | 02 /
Didier, Daniel 119 rue Louis Baudoin 91100 Corbeil / FR | 03 /
Ducrocq, Christian 12 sentier du Gaillon 91480 Varennes-Jarcy / FR | 04 /
Imbourg, Sébastien 1 avenue du Général Leclerc 91330 Yerres / FR | 05 /
Palmisano, Laurent 3 rue Keranna 91330 Yerres / FR | 06 /
Rongvaux, Jean-Marc 15 rue Langevin 91290 La Norville / FR | 07 /
Verbrugge, André 43 rue Sermanoise 77380 Combs la Ville / FR | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/19] | 01 /
Crozet, François Les Rives de l'Yerres BT C2, rue Pierre de Coubert 91330 Yerres / FR | ||
02 /
Didier, Daniel 119 rue Louis Baudoin 91100 Corbeil / FR | |||
03 /
Ducrocq, Christian 12 sentier du Gaillon 91480 Varennes-Jarcy / FR | |||
04 /
Imbourg, Sébastien 1 avenue du Général Leclerc 91330 Yerres / FR | |||
05 /
Palmisano, Laurent 3 rue Keranna 91330 Yerres / FR | |||
06 /
Rongvaux, Jean-Marc 15 rue Langevin 91290 La Norville / FR | |||
07 /
Verbrugge, André 43 rue Sermanoise 77380 Combs la Ville / FR | |||
Former [2003/10] | 01 /
Crozet, François Les Rives de l'Yerres BT C2, rue Pierre de Coubert 91330 Yerres / FR | ||
02 /
Didier, Daniel 119 rue Louis Baudoin 91100 Borbeil / FR | |||
03 /
Ducrocq, Christian 12 sentier du Gaillon 91480 Varennes-Jarcy / FR | |||
04 /
Imbourg, Sébastien 1 avenue du Général Leclerc 9130 Yerres / FR | |||
05 /
Palmisano, Laurent 3 rue Keranna 91330 Yerres / FR | |||
06 /
Rongvaux, Jean-Marc 15 rue Langevin 91290 La Norville / FR | |||
07 /
Verbrugge, André 43 rue Sermanoise 77380 Combs la Ville / FR | Application number, filing date | 02292127.4 | 29.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | FR20010011232 | 30.08.2001 Original published format: FR 0111232 | [2003/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1288444 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1288444 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/24, F01D11/24, F01D25/14 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
F01D11/24 (EP,US);
F01D25/145 (EP,US);
F01D25/246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/48] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Befestigung von Statorelementen in einem Turbomaschinengehäuse | [2003/10] | English: | Fixing stator elements in a turbomachine casing | [2003/10] | French: | Attachement des éléments de stator dans le carter d'une turbomachine | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Request for further processing for: | 21.01.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.02.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4131388 (BRODELL ROBERT F); | [A]GB2076071 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP); | [Y]GB2115487 (GEN ELECTRIC) [Y] 1-8 * column A; figures 1-4; claims 1-11 *; | [Y]US5145316 (BIRCH KENNETH W [GB]) [Y] 1-8 * column W *; | [Y]FR2683851 (SNECMA [FR]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0618349 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]); | [Y]EP0651139 (SNECMA [FR]) [Y] 1-8 * figures 1-12; claims 8-13 * |