EP1415847 - Bearing support arrangements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault S.A. 13-15 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2004/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
François, Jean Claude 10 allée des Bourreliers 78310 Coignieres / FR | 02 /
Rouyer, Johan Vincent 38 rue des Bas Rogers 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Davies, Owen Robert Treharne RENAULT TECHNOCENTRE Département Propriété Intellectuelle Sce 00267 TCR GRA 2 36 1, avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt cedex / FR | [2008/43] |
Former [2004/19] | Davies, Owen Robert Treharne Renault, 1 avenue du Golf, Sce 0267 TCR AVA 056 78288 Guyancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 02292693.5 | 30.10.2002 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415847 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415847 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/24, F16C35/00 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
B60K17/24 (EP);
F16C35/00 (EP);
F16C2326/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/05] |
Former [2005/04] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lagergehäuse | [2004/19] | English: | Bearing support arrangements | [2004/19] | French: | Système de support pour un corps de palier | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 11.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2006 | CH | 06.09.2006 | CY | 06.09.2006 | EE | 06.09.2006 | FI | 06.09.2006 | LI | 06.09.2006 | NL | 06.09.2006 | TR | 06.09.2006 | LU | 30.10.2006 | IE | 31.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | BG | 06.12.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.12.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
TR | 06.09.2006 | ||
LU | 30.10.2006 | ||
IE | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
EE | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
IE | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
BG | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR724292 (BOUCHER SA DES ETS) [X] 1-9 * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 10; | [A]US3140901 (YOUNG WILLIAM A) [A] 2 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE3209657 (GELENKWELLENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 2,3 * page 5, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * figures 1,4,5,7 *; | [X]US4412753 (LINN JAMES F [US]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4652151 (SIEBERT CRAIG [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 24 - line 30 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4676670 (NISLEY DONALD L [US]) [X] 1,4,7 * abstract * * figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US5234271 (LINDSTROEM STIG [SE]) [Y] 10 * figures 1-3 *; | [DA]US5551783 (WHITNEY TIM M [US], et al) [DA] 10* the whole document *; | [A]US5681117 (WELLMAN STANLEY PAUL [US], et al) [A] 2 * figure 2 * |