EP1313234 - Dynamic control of an optical module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Optronics France 12 rue de la Baume 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamoir, Dominique 16, rue des Acacias 91620 Nozay / FR | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/21] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 44/52, Rue de la Justice 75020 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02292834.5 | 14.11.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | FR20010014791 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0114791 | [2003/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1313234 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/08 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H04B10/077 (EP,US);
H04B10/07955 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/07] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dynamische Steuerung des optischen Moduls | [2003/21] | English: | Dynamic control of an optical module | [2003/21] | French: | Procédé de contrôle dynamique d'un module optique | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/49] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0874477 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 16, line 14 - column 20, line 7 * * column 21, line 25 - column 22, line 26 * * column 26, line 1 - column 27, line 40 * * column 35, line 38 - column 37, line 14 ** figures 16-18,20,25,36 *; | [X]WO0165733 (MCI WORLDCOM INC [US]) [X] 1,4-7,10,11,14-16 * abstract * * page 12, line 22 - page 14, line 15 * * claims 1-4,10 * * figure 10 * |