EP1335614 - Improvements in DTMF tone detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company (a Delaware Corporation) 3000 Hanover Street Palo ALto CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Company, a Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [2003/33] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Company, a Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauvage, Pierre 4 Impasse des Gourgy 38450 Notre Dame de Commiers / FR | 02 /
Morlat, Simon 35 avenue de Vizille, Apt 42 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Richard Graham, et al Hewlett Packard Espanola, SL Legal Department Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Saint Cugat del Vallés Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Lloyd, Richard Graham, et al Hewlett Packard CCF IP Section - Legal Department 5, Avenue Raymond Chanas-Eybens 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/33] | Lloyd, Richard Graham, et al Intellectual Property Section, Legal Department, HEWLETT-PACKARD FRANCE, Etablissement de Grenoble 38053 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02354026.3 | 08.02.2002 | [2003/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1335614 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1335614 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/453, H04Q1/457 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
H04Q1/457 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/33] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen in Beziehung zur Detektion eines Zweitonmehrfrequenzsignales | [2003/33] | English: | Improvements in DTMF tone detection | [2003/33] | French: | Améliorations concernant la détéction d'un signal DTMF | [2003/33] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 27.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2007 | BE | 07.11.2007 | CH | 07.11.2007 | CY | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | LI | 07.11.2007 | NL | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | SE | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | IE | 08.02.2008 | LU | 08.02.2008 | ES | 18.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
TR | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
IE | 08.02.2008 | ||
LU | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
IE | 08.02.2008 | ||
LU | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
IE | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
IE | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
IE | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4689760 (LEE CHIN-HUI [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column A; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 68 * * column 11, line 29 - column 12, line 38 *; | [X]US5119322 (STROOBACH JERRY [CA]) [X] 1 * column A; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US5477465 (ZHENG BAOHUA [US]) [DA] 1,9 * column A; figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 30 - line 46 *; | [DY]US5694466 (XIE ZHENG-YI [US], et al) [DY] 9 * column A; figures 2,4,5 * * column 6, line 6 - line 53 *; | [XY]US5809133 (BARTKOWIAK JOHN G [US], et al) [X] 1 * column A; figures 2,3,5-7 * * column 13, line 38 - column 14, line 11 * *Idem* [Y] 9; | [X]US6229889 (CANNON JOSEPH M [US], et al) [X] 1 * column A; figures 1-4 * * column 2, line 46 - line 59 * * column 5, line 1 - line 57 *; | [A] - GAY S L ET AL, "ALGORITHMS FOR MULTI-CHANNEL DTMF DETECTION FOR THE WE DSP32 FAMILY", SPEECH PROCESSING 2, DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING. GLASGOW, MAY 23 - 26, 1989, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH & SIGNAL PROCESSING. ICASSP, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19890523), vol. 2 CONF. 14, pages 1134 - 1137, XP000090308 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |