EP1247630 - Bucket mixer with at least one mixing element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bidet, Yves 1 rue Lucien Gachon 63730 Les Martres de Veyre / FR | [2002/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bidet, Yves 1, rue Lucien Gachon 63730 Les Martres De Veyre / FR | 02 /
Rodde, Stéphan Courcourt 63116 Beauregard L'Eveque / FR | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Chanet, Jacques 56, avenue de Royat B.P. 27 63401 Chamalières Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Chanet, Jacques 56, avenue de Royat B.P. 27 63401 Chamalières Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02356048.5 | 11.03.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | FR20010004485 | 03.04.2001 Original published format: FR 0104485 | FR20010015574 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0115574 | [2002/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1247630 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B28C5/42, E02F3/40, B66C3/02 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
E02F3/404 (EP);
B28C5/4296 (EP);
B66C3/02 (EP);
E02F3/401 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Extension states | RO | 31.03.2003 | Title | German: | Mischbecher mit zumindest einem Mischkörper | [2002/41] | English: | Bucket mixer with at least one mixing element | [2002/41] | French: | Godet preneur à au moins un organe de malaxage | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 23.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0952224 ; | [A]US3737059 (PETERSON R, et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2630370 (ROUX IND SA [FR]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9214887 (HEATH ANTONY [AU]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5277489 (HAMM ALTON B [US]) [A] 3,4* the whole document *; | [A]DE4418580 (UMWELT TECHNICS NORD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 5 - line 12 * * figure 1; claims 1,3 *; | [DA]FR2759621 (RABAUD SA [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09052224 A 19970225 (NIKKO CO LTD) [A] 3,4 * abstract * |