EP1301023 - Automatic process for enriching a digital image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vau, Jean-Marie, c/o Kodak Industrie Département Brevets CRT 60/2, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saone Cedex / FR | 02 /
Franchini, Thibault, Jean-Baptiste 18 bis, rue Pierre Demours 75017 Paris / FR | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/15] | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02356178.0 | 20.09.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | FR20010012764 | 04.10.2001 Original published format: FR 0112764 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1301023 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/21, H04N1/32, H04N1/00 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
H04N1/32112 (EP,US);
H04N1/00127 (EP,US);
H04N1/32101 (EP,US);
H04N1/32122 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3204 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3225 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/01] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Automatisches Verfahren zur Bereicherung von Bilddaten | [2003/15] | English: | Automatic process for enriching a digital image | [2003/15] | French: | Procédé automatique d'enrichissement d'image numérique | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/15] | 19.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0545446 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0779086 (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [XA]US5815201 (HASHIMOTO TETSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-12; | [A]US5864337 (MARVIN JOHN [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5938531 (YASUSHI MITSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [XA]US5982981 (SATOH YOSHIAKI [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-12 | Examination | WO0045587 | US6229566 |