EP1432160 - Method and system for handling data between a clock and data recovery circuit and a data processing unit in asynchronous networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sund, Matthias Conradstrasse 54 13509 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Wolde, Jürgen Ahornstrasse 5 15732 Schulzendorf / DE | 03 /
Karstädt, Jörg Strehlener Strasse 15 12621 Berlin / DE | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Brose, Gerhard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Brose, Gerhard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Brose, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02360358.2 | 18.12.2002 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1432160 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1432160 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, H04L12/00 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
H04J3/0632 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Bearbeiten von Daten zwischen einer Schaltungsanordnung zur Rückgewinnung einesTaktsignals und eins Datensignals und einer Datenverarbeitungseinheit in asynchronen Netzwerken | [2006/16] | English: | Method and system for handling data between a clock and data recovery circuit and a data processing unit in asynchronous networks | [2004/26] | French: | Procédé et système de traitement de données entre une unité de récupération d'horloge et de données et une unité de traitement de données dans des réseaux asynchrones | [2006/16] |
Former [2004/26] | Verfahren und System zum Bearbeiten von Daten zwischen einer Schaltungsanordnung zur Rückgewinnung des Taktsignals und des Datensignals und einer Datenverarbeitungseinheit in asynchronen Netzwerken | ||
Former [2004/26] | Procédé et système de traitement de données entre un unité de récupération d'horloge et de données et un unité de traitement de données dans réseaux asynchrones | Examination procedure | 13.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | BE | 21.06.2006 | CH | 21.06.2006 | CY | 21.06.2006 | CZ | 21.06.2006 | EE | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | LI | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | SI | 21.06.2006 | SK | 21.06.2006 | TR | 21.06.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | ES | 02.10.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | IE | 18.12.2006 | LU | 18.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
TR | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 18.12.2006 | ||
LU | 18.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 18.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 18.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 18.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 18.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2693333 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 4, line 30 - page 8, line 25 ** figure 11 *; | [A]GB2275852 (SONY BROADCAST & COMMUNICATION [GB], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, line 19 - line 35 * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 26 * * page 6, line 9 - line 24 * * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 1 *; | [DA]US6166963 (WEN SHEUNG-FAN [US]) [DA] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 23 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 48 *; | [DA]US6278718 (ESCHHOLZ SIEGMAR K [US]) [DA] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 62 * * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 59 * * column 9, line 8 - column 13, line 9 * * figures 3,6-8 *; | [A]GB2362777 (3COM CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 7 * * page 3, line 7 - line 12 * * page 4, line 15 - line 26 * * page 5, line 22 - page 7, line 4 * * figure 1 * |