EP1262743 - Apparatus for connecting a water metering unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PERSOHN S.A. Le Rey F-33430 Bazas / FR | [2002/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Persohn, Philippe 1, Lubata 33430 Sauviac / FR | 02 /
Persohn, Jean-Pierre Soubriquet 33730 Pompejac / FR | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Maupilier, Didier, et al Ipside Boîte postale CS 40009 7-9 allées Haussmann 33070 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Maupilier, Didier, et al Schmit Chretien SNC 111 Cours du Médoc CS 400009 33070 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/13] | Maupilier, Didier, et al Schmit Chretien Parc de Basso Cambo West Park 4, rue Paul Mesplé 31100 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2002/49] | Thébault, Jean-Louis Cabinet Thébault 111 cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 02362010.7 | 29.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | FR20010007069 | 30.05.2001 Original published format: FR 0107069 | [2002/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1262743 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01F15/18, E03B7/07 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
E03B7/072 (EP);
G01F15/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Anschluss für eine Wasserzähleranlage | [2002/49] | English: | Apparatus for connecting a water metering unit | [2002/49] | French: | Dispositif de raccordement pour poste de comptage d'eau | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 05.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8508054U (BOPP & REUTHER GMBH) [X] 1 * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 33; figure 1 *; | [X]DE8713027U (FLEGE) [X] 1* figure 1 *; | [X]DE4204344 (FRITZ GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 12 - line 36; figure 2 *; | [X]FR2800401 (SAINTE LIZAIGNE SA [FR]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 32 - page 8, line 24; figure 3 * |